#### Multiplication Tricks are very handy in IBPS PO Exam because they speed up your calculations and save time in competitive exams. Multiplying Numbers will never be the same with these calculation tricks.

Name any competitive exam… SBI PO, IBPS, SSC Exam, InsuranceExams, Railway Recruitment Board Exams… Irrespective of the name of the exam that you are appearing for, multiplying numbers is a task you cannot run from. Calculation tricks especially multiplication tricks are therefore a basic need in all competitive exams. We all know that multiplication amongst big numbers can not only be quite a challenge but also be very time-consuming. And time is definitely not your friend in such exams. So in this series dedicated to Calculation Tricks, we have discussed some really time effective ways to do calculations. Read on to get

some multiplication tricks up your sleeve. This trick will help you in multiplying numbers with 25.

some multiplication tricks up your sleeve. This trick will help you in multiplying numbers with 25.

**Why do you Need Multiplication Tricks?**

Almost every second question in the Quantitative Aptitude Section of IBPS PO Exam has you multiplying numbers. Therefore it becomes almost imperative that you have skills that help calculate accurately and quickly. And expertise in multiplying numbers using multiplication tricks can come very handy and help you get closer to the cut off. Here we will discuss multiplying numbers with 25.

**A Question where Multiplication Tricks help Multiplying Numbers with 25**

436x 25 = ?

1) 15600 2)10900 3)13400 4) 14600 5) None of these

**Conventional Method of Multiplying Numbers with 25**

How you do normally do you multiply these two numbers? Get a pen and paper, quickly scribble some numbers, do some multiplication with 5 and 2 respectively, then

do some addition and then finally you get your answer!

do some addition and then finally you get your answer!

Undoubtedly

this answer is correct and follows the method we were taught in school but what

you forget is that multiplying numbers like this also takes 10 seconds!

this answer is correct and follows the method we were taught in school but what

you forget is that multiplying numbers like this also takes 10 seconds!

**Smart Method Using Multiplication Tricks**

Time to upgrade and use some multiplication tricks that help you complete this calculation quicker and faster! Some multiplication tricks that will not need you to use

pen and paper but just reach the answer verbally! Multiplying numbers with 25 can be done by

pen and paper but just reach the answer verbally! Multiplying numbers with 25 can be done by

**So all you need to do is***just substituting 25 with 100/4.***which is just adding 2 zeros to get the answer.***divide the given number by 4 and multiply that number with 100,*

**Step 1:**

436 x 25=

436 x (100/4)

436 x (100/4)

**Step 2:**

(436/4) x 100= 109 x 100 = 10900

We all know the table to 4 really well and this calculation is just like mental math! Simple! Quick! Easy!

Practice these questions with multiplication tricks-

**Question 1:**1234 x 25 = ?

1)30850 2)34400 3)31700 4) 37700 5) None of these

**Question 2:**6317 x 25 = ?

1) 150345 2)188575 3) 121485 4) 156855 5)157925

Do write in the comments section below how much time this multiplication tricks helped you save!

## Leave a Reply

Be the First to Comment!